ND SB2035 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 4.1-01-19, paragraph 6 of subdivision b of subsection 2 of section 10-19.1-115, subsection 1 of section 15.1-07-33, subsection 6 of section 23-02.1-27, sections 23-07-07.6, 43-17-06, 43-17-14, 43-17-17, 43-17-24, 43-17-25, and 43-17-30, subsection 1 of section 54-07-01.2, and sections 57-51-16 and 61-04-06.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to technical corrections and improper, inaccurate, redundant, missing, or obsolete references; and to repeal section 61-03-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to technical corrections and improper, inaccurate, redundant, missing, or obsolete references.
Title
Technical corrections and improper, inaccurate, redundant, missing, or obsolete references.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/17 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2 |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:45 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |