ND SB2035 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 43-15-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to pharmacist administration of immunizations and vaccinations to minors.
Title
Pharmacist administration of immunizations and vaccinations to minors.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25 | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by Governor 04/25 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-05 | Concurred | |
2011-03-15 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-03-14 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0 | |
2011-03-10 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-07 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Received from Senate | |
2011-01-26 | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 | |
2011-01-25 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 0 | |
2011-01-20 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-10 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-01-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-01-05 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |