ND SB2024 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the ethics commission; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide for a legislative management report.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the ethics commission; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide for a legislative management report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 52 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29 |
2023-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-24 | House | Emergency clause failed |
2023-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 52 nays 39 |
2023-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 10, Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed Pyle Meier Mock |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Davison Dever Mathern |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-04-11 | House | Emergency clause failed |
2023-04-11 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 54 nays 34 |
2023-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 4 3 |
2023-04-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:37 |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee Hearing 04:10 |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 30 nays 17 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:49 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:31 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |