ND SB2023 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the public employees retirement system; and to provide a contingent appropriation.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the public employees retirement system; and to provide a contingent appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29 |
2023-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 82 nays 9 |
2023-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Meier Pyle Mock |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Dever Davison Mathern |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 80 nays 10 |
2023-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 2 2 |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee Hearing 11:03 |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee Hearing 04:20 |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:50 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:44 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:37 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |