ND SB2022 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by Governor 06/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by Governor 06/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of various state retirement and investment agencies; to provide various transfers; to create and enact section 54-52.1-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the terms of public employees retirement system contracts for uniform group health insurance benefits coverage; to amend and reenact subsection 17 of section 54-52-01 and sections 54-52-03 and 54-52.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the public employees retirement system board and disclosure of information by uniform group health insurance benefits coverage carriers; and to limit the use of health insurance program reserves.
Title
The public employees retirement system board and disclosure of information by uniform group health insurance benefits coverage carriers; and to limit the use of health insurance program reserves.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor 06/16 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-06-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-06-16 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 73 nays 16 |
2015-06-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-06-16 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 6 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-06-16 | House | New conference committee appointed Carlson Vigesaa Hogan |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Wardner G. Lee Heckaman |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach Dever Heckaman |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee report rejected |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference committee appointed Thoreson Keiser Hogan |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach Dever Heckaman |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-24 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 82 nays 6 |
2015-04-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 3 2 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |