ND SB2005 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state treasurer; and to amend and reenact section 54-11-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the state treasurer.
Title
The salary of the state treasurer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Concurred |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 7 |
2023-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 2 5 |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee Hearing 11:21 |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee Hearing 04:30 |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:35 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |