ND HCR3067 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Klein, Miller, Wanzek (Approved by the Delayed Bills Committee) A concurrent resolution urging the restoration, through legal or political means, of the Environmental Protection Agency's final rule exempting pesticides from the Clean Water Act's permitting requirements.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Klein, Miller, Wanzek (Approved by the Delayed Bills Committee) A concurrent resolution urging the restoration, through legal or political means, of the Environmental Protection Agency's final rule exempting pesticides from the Clean Water Act's permitting requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-27 | Returned to House | |
2009-04-27 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-04-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-04-22 | Received from House | |
2009-04-22 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-04-22 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 000 | |
2009-04-22 | Report back amend, do pass, place on consent cal y 009 n 000 | |
2009-04-21 | Committee Hearing 03:00 | |
2009-04-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba3067.html |