ND HCR3054 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the necessary steps and resources, including funding, to eliminate human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) and acquired immunodeficiency syndrome (AIDS) in North Dakota.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the necessary steps and resources, including funding, to eliminate human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) and acquired immunodeficiency syndrome (AIDS) in North Dakota.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01 |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-03-06 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearing 04:15 |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |