ND HCR3043 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the filling of vacancies in the Legislative Assembly.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the filling of vacancies in the Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-06 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-05 | Returned to House | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 | |
2011-04-04 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-03-28 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-25 | Received from House | |
2011-03-24 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 8 0 3 | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Hearing 02:40 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Constitutional Revision Committee |