ND HCR3042 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 21 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 21 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact sections
Title
The election of a higher education commissioner; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Alex Looysen [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 21 nays 70 |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 0 |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba3042.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-3100-01000.pdf |