ND HCR3040 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the Congress of the United States to audit the Federal Reserve.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the Congress of the United States to audit the Federal Reserve.
Sponsors
Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] | Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Sen. Bob Paulson [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-08 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 74 nays 14 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-25 | House | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2019-01-25 | House | Request return from committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |