ND HCR3036 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the trial by jury rights of a person charged with the commission of a misdemeanor, including the extent to which jury trials are conducted in the state for cases involving misdemeanor offenses; the costs of jury trials for misdemeanor offenses; the feasibility and desirability of eliminating the sentencing option of imprisonment for Class B misdemeanors; a review of the jury trial process of other states; and the right to a jury trial in civil traffic cases.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the trial by jury rights of a person charged with the commission of a misdemeanor, including the extent to which jury trials are conducted in the state for cases involving misdemeanor offenses; the costs of jury trials for misdemeanor offenses; the feasibility and desirability of eliminating the sentencing option of imprisonment for Class B misdemeanors; a review of the jury trial process of other states; and the right to a jury trial in civil traffic cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Boehning [R] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] |
Sen. Dave Nething [R] | Sen. Curtis Olafson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-08 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-07 | Concurred | |
2011-03-29 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading, adopted as amended | |
2011-03-25 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Received from House | |
2011-02-18 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1 | |
2011-02-14 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |