ND HCR3033 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Bakke, Fiebiger A concurrent resolution designating June 19 as Juneteenth National Freedom Day.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Bakke, Fiebiger A concurrent resolution designating June 19 as Juneteenth National Freedom Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Second reading, failed to adopt | |
2009-03-23 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 003 n 002 | |
2009-03-20 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-02-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back amended, without recommendation y 006 n 006 | |
2009-02-12 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-29 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba3033.html |