ND HCR3024 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 18 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 18 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact sections 1, 14, 15, and 16 of article X of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to prohibiting the levy of property tax except for limited purposes, replacing lost property tax revenue through increased sales tax, and prohibiting the issuance of general obligation bonds secured with property tax; to repeal sections 4, 5, 7, 9, and 10 of article X of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to prohibiting the levy of property tax; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Prohibiting the levy of property tax; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Hoverson [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Rep. Lori VanWinkle [R] |
Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 18 nays 75 |
2023-03-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-10 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 11:36 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |