ND HCR3023 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 02/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 02/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution declaring March 5, 2015, as "Canada Day in North Dakota".
Title
A concurrent resolution declaring March 5, 2015, as "Canada Day in North Dakota".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 02/25 |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Returned to House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-11 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 89 nays 1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |