ND HCR3022 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 16 nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 16 nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section 23 of article I of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to the rejection of unconstitutional federal actions.
Title
The rejection of unconstitutional federal actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 16 nays 30 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-03-13 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 61 nays 30 |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment failed, placed on calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2015-03-11 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 1 2 |
2015-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |