ND HCR3012 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 12 nays 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 12 nays 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution recognizing the constitutional duty of Congress to declare war and the unconstitutional deployment of military personnel to active duty pursuant to clause 11 of section 8 of article I of the United States Constitution.
Title
A concurrent resolution recognizing the constitutional duty of Congress to declare war and the unconstitutional deployment of military personnel to active duty pursuant to clause 11 of section 8 of article I of the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 12 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 12 nays 81 |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Political Subdivisions |