ND HCR3012 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the United States Air Force to select the Grand Forks Air Force Base as the active duty main operating base for the new KC-46A refueling tanker mission.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the United States Air Force to select the Grand Forks Air Force Base as the active duty main operating base for the new KC-46A refueling tanker mission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22 |
2013-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 12 0 2 |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |