ND HCR3005 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 43 nays 48
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 43 nays 48
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section 9 of article V of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to requiring the governor to call a special session of the legislative assembly to consider a veto if the governor vetoes a bill or item when the legislative assembly is not in session.
Title
Requiring the governor to call a special session of the legislative assembly to consider a veto if the governor vetoes a bill or item when the legislative assembly is not in session.
Sponsors
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Sen. Cole Conley [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 43 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 43 nays 48 |
2023-03-13 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2023-03-08 | House | Laid over three legislative days |
2023-03-07 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0 |
2023-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 11:20 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:25 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 11:20 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 04:15 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 04:15 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Government and Veterans Affairs |