ND HCR3005 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 24 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 24 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section
Title
Initiated constitutional amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Chet Pollert [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Sen. Bill Bowman [R] | Sen. Stanley Lyson [R] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 24 nays 69 |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 2 0 |
2013-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba3005.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-3023-01000.pdf |