ND HCR3003 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to continue studying the impact of federal health care reform legislation on this state.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to continue studying the impact of federal health care reform legislation on this state.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-29 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-25 | Returned to House | |
2011-03-24 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-03-21 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Received from House | |
2011-01-17 | Second reading, adopted yeas 92 nays 0 | |
2011-01-14 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 | |
2011-01-12 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2011-01-05 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |