ND HCR3001 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Advisory Commission on Intergovernmental Relations) A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study issues related to development of group housing and crew camps, including infrastructure demands, health and safety requirements, regulation, and enforcement of regulatory violations.
Title
(Advisory Commission on Intergovernmental Relations) A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study issues related to development of group housing and crew camps, including infrastructure demands, health and safety requirements, regulation, and enforcement of regulatory violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08 |
2013-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-21 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 90 nays 0 |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 0 0 |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |