ND HB1563 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 074
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 074
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Oehlke A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reduction in individual income tax rates; to amend and reenact section 57-38-30 and subsection 1 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reductions in corporate and individual income tax rates; to repeal sections 57-38-01.3, 57-38-01.4, 57-38-11, 57-38-14, 57-38-30, 57-38-30.1, 57-38-30.5, 57-38-30.6, 57-38-32, and 57-38-60.1 and chapter 57-38.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to elimination of corporate income taxes; to provide for transfers; and to provide contingent effective dates.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Oehlke A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reduction in individual income tax rates; to amend and reenact section 57-38-30 and subsection 1 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reductions in corporate and individual income tax rates; to repeal sections 57-38-01.3, 57-38-01.4, 57-38-11, 57-38-14, 57-38-30, 57-38-30.1, 57-38-30.5, 57-38-30.6, 57-38-32, and 57-38-60.1 and chapter 57-38.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to elimination of corporate income taxes; to provide for transfers; and to provide contingent effective dates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 074 | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 010 n 003 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1563.html |