ND HB1542 | 2023 | 68th Legislative Assembly Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 10/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 10/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the judicial branch for employer retirement contribution funding; to provide for retroactive application; and to provide an effective date.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the judicial branch for employer retirement contribution funding; to provide for retroactive application; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-30 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 10/25 |
2023-10-25 | House | Signed by Governor 10/25 |
2023-10-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-10-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-10-25 | House | Returned to House |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 1 1 |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Joint Appropriations |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-10-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 4 |
2023-10-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 17 2 4 |
2023-10-23 | House | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2023-10-23 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Joint Appropriations |