ND HB1530 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to covered services for medical assistance.
Title
Covered services for medical assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Schobinger [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Rep. Greg Stemen [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13 |
2023-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2023-04-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned to House |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 5 1 0 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 1 1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 06:30 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-02-08 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | House | Amendment adopted |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 04:12 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |