ND HB1525 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Pomeroy A BILL for an Act to provide for a workforce safety and insurance study of post-retirement benefits within the workers compensation system.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Pomeroy A BILL for an Act to provide for a workforce safety and insurance study of post-retirement benefits within the workers compensation system.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Amerman [D] | Rep. Jerome Kelsh [D] | Rep. Lisa Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-23 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-19 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-17 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-03-11 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-02-12 | Received from House | |
2009-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 001 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1525.html |