CA AB2351 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 48900, 48900.2, 48900.3, 48900.4, 48900.5, 48900.7, and 48900.8 of the Education Code, relating to pupil discipline.
Title
Suspensions and expulsions: acts occurring outside of school hours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 3). |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48900.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48900.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48900.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48900.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48900.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48900.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |