ND HB1514 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 61-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to surety for installers of subsurface water management systems; and to amend and reenact section 61-32-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an exemption from permitting requirements for subsurface water management systems; and to repeal section 61-32-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permitting subsurface water management systems.
Title
Permitting subsurface water management systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. James Schmidt [R] |
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 62 |
2019-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 2 2 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |