ND HB1490 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Dotzenrod A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 16.1-08.1-01, section 16.1-08.1-03.2, and subsection 1 of section 16.1-08.1-03.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to campaign finance.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Dotzenrod A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 16.1-08.1-01, section 16.1-08.1-03.2, and subsection 1 of section 16.1-08.1-03.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-23 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-04-23 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-22 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-22 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-04-22 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-22 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-21 | Appointed Horne to replace Nelson on conf comm | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Dever Oehlke Nelson | |
2009-04-13 | Conf comm appointed Froseth Karls Winrich | |
2009-04-13 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-06 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-06 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-03 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-19 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 001 | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-30 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1490.html |