ND HB1483 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possession of a firearm at a public gathering or in a federal building or courthouse; to repeal section 62.1-02-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the possession of a firearm in a liquor establishment; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The possession of a firearm in a liquor establishment; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 61 |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:10 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |