ND HB1466 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to contracts for the provision of educational services by nonpublic schools.
Title
Contracts for the provision of educational services by nonpublic schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Dosch [R] | Rep. Brenda Heller [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] | Sen. Margaret Sitte [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 63 |
2013-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 7 1 |
2013-02-13 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 5 2 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |