ND HB1457 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for a school district nursing services grant program.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for a school district nursing services grant program.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Sen. Tony Grindberg [R] | Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] |
Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-11 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 51 | |
2011-02-08 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2011-02-03 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 0 | |
2011-02-01 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-21 | Request return from committee | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1457.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-8232-01000.pdf |