ND HB1453 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 072
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 072
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Cook A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-21.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to wheelchair accessibility of businesses that receive state or local economic development funds; and to provide for application.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Cook A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-21.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to wheelchair accessibility of businesses that receive state or local economic development funds; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-12 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 072 | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amend, dnp, placed on calendar y 010 n 002 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1453.html |