ND HB1447 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 50 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to creation of the opioid settlement fund, creation of the opioid settlement advisory committee, and use of opioid settlement funds; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 21-10-06 and section 23-01-42 of the North Dakota Century Code and section 5 of chapter 3 of the 2021 Session Laws, relating to funds under management of the state investment board, opioid antagonist prescription, distribution, possession, or use, and the funding of the opioid treatment and prevention program; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Funds under management of the state investment board, opioid antagonist prescription, distribution, possession, or use, and the funding of the opioid treatment and prevention program; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Greg Stemen [R] |
Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/01 |
2023-04-29 | House | Signed by Governor 04/29 |
2023-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 8, Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-21 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Lee Cleary K. Roers |
2023-04-11 | House | Conference committee appointed Beltz Weisz Dobervich |
2023-04-11 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 04:15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Human Services |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2023-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee Hearing 11:12 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), Human Services Committee |