ND HB1438 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 47-32-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the contents of a notice of intention to evict.
Title
The contents of a notice of intention to evict.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 16 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 78 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |