ND HB1434 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 50-24.8-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to investigative demands and administrative subpoenas of the Medicaid fraud control unit.
Title
Investigative demands and administrative subpoenas of the Medicaid fraud control unit.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Beltz [R] | Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] | Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Greg Stemen [R] |
Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Sen. Jonathan Sickler [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-13 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2023-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 03:04 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-18 | House | Rereferred to Human Services |
2023-01-18 | House | Request return from committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |