ND HB1431 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 6-09 and a new section to chapter 6-09.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a water infrastructure revolving loan fund and bonded debt repayments; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 6-09-49, and sections 6-09.4-06 and 6-09.4-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to interest rates for infrastructure revolving loans, borrowing and lending authority of the public finance authority, and reserve funds associated with bonds; to repeal chapter 6-09.5 and section 61-02-78 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a community water development fund and an infrastructure revolving loan fund within the resources trust fund; to provide an appropriation; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide for a contingent transfer; to provide a bond issue limit; and to provide a loan repayment.
Title
A community water development fund and an infrastructure revolving loan fund within the resources trust fund; to provide an appropriation; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide for a contingent transfer; to provide a bond issue limit; and to provide a loan repayment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2021-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment failed, placed on calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 17 |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 4 3 |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |