ND HB1430 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 16.1-08.1-01, 16.1-08.1-03.3, 16.1-08.1-03.5, 16.1-08.1-03.12, and 16.1-08.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to campaign contributions and expenditures; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Campaign contributions and expenditures; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 67 |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1430.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0117-01000.pdf |