ND HB1429 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 056
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 056
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 and a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit to provide a sales tax rebate to taxpayers; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 and a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit to provide a sales tax rebate to taxpayers; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 056 | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amend, dnp, placed on calendar y 008 n 005 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1429.html |