ND HB1426 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact four new sections to chapter 43-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulation of dental therapists; and to amend and reenact sections 43-20-01.1 and 43-20-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to dental therapist definition and unlawful practice of dental hygiene, dental therapy, and dentistry.
Title
Dental therapist definition and unlawful practice of dental hygiene, dental therapy, and dentistry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 62 |
2019-02-11 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-02-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |