ND HB1426 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 44-08-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to travel reimbursement rates for state employees and officers.
Title
Travel reimbursement rates for state employees and officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Boehning [R] | Rep. Brenda Heller [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] |
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25 | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by Governor 04/25 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-12 | Concurred | |
2011-04-08 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-04-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 | |
2011-04-06 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-23 | Committee Hearing 04:00 | |
2011-03-21 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-03-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-03-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-22 | Received from House | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 12 | |
2011-02-16 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2011-02-11 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 9 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 | |
2011-01-28 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |