ND HB1424 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 16.1-08.1-03.2, subsection 1 of section 16.1-11-06, section 16.1-11-09, subsection 1 of section 16.1-11-11, and subsection 1 of section 16.1-11-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a candidate's contact information and the form of a nominating petition and a certificate of endorsement.
Title
A candidate's contact information and the form of a nominating petition and a certificate of endorsement.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Conmy [D] | Sen. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Hamida Dakane [D] | Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] |
Rep. Zachary Ista [D] | Rep. Scott Wagner [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Merrill Piepkorn [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05 |
2023-04-05 | House | Signed by Governor 04/04 |
2023-04-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-31 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 5 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:43 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 11 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 6 0 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Political Subdivisions |