ND HB1424 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 027 nays 065
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 027 nays 065
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Oehlke A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the state department of health for a statewide swimming pool program.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Oehlke A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the state department of health for a statewide swimming pool program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-13 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 027 nays 065 | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 005 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1424.html |