ND HB1415 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 12 of section 53-06.1-01, subsections 1 and 4 of section 53-06.1-01.1, subsections 2 and 3 of section 53-06.1-03, subsections 1 and 3 of section 53-06.1-06, subsection 1 of section 53-06.1-10.2, subsection 1 of section 53-06.1-11, subsection 3 of section 53-06.1-14, and subsection 8 of section 53-06.1-15.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to games of chance.
Title
Games of chance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2017-04-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 13 |
2017-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 6 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 2 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |