ND HB1414 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a resident family member small game license.
Title
A resident family member small game license.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] |
Sen. Doug Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 5 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 85 |
2023-02-10 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 10:35 |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |