ND HB1413 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a veteran scholarship program; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
The creation of a veteran scholarship program; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Kylie Oversen [D] | Rep. Bill Amerman [D] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Alan Fehr [R] |
Rep. Bob Hunskor [D] | Rep. Jay Seibel [R] | Sen. Ron Carlisle [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] |
Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 27 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 66 |
2015-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 3 1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |