ND HB1413 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Flakoll, Klein, Taylor A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 4-10.6 of the North Dakota Century Code or in the alternative to create and enact section 4.1-04-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to corn utilization council elections; and to amend and reenact sections 4-10.6-02 and 4-10.6-08 of the North Dakota Century Code or in the alternative to amend and reenact sections 4.1-04-04 and 4.1-04-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to corn assessments.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Flakoll, Klein, Taylor A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 4-10.6 of the North Dakota Century Code or in the alternative to create and enact section 4.1-04-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to corn utilization council elections; and to amend and reenact sections 4-10.6-02 and 4-10.6-08 of the North Dakota Century Code or in the alternative to amend and reenact sections 4.1-04-04 and 4.1-04-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to corn assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-23 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-19 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 09:18 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 000 | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 011 n 000 | |
2009-02-12 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1413.html |