ND HB1412 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 57-36-01, 57-36-02, 57-36-04, 57-36-05, 57-36-09, and 57-36-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensing requirements and the sale of electronic smoking devices; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Licensing requirements and the sale of electronic smoking devices; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/23 |
2023-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2023-03-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 1 0 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry and Business |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 35 |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 3 4 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 03:08 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |