ND HB1412 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-35-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the membership of the tribal and state relations committee.
Title
The membership of the tribal and state relations committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 25 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 61 |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 4 3 |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |