ND HB1409 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 20.1-03-07.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to nonresident youth hunting licenses for small game and waterfowl.
Title
Nonresident youth hunting licenses for small game and waterfowl.
Sponsors
Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Anna Novak [R] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16 |
2023-03-17 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 10:38 |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |